KS SB312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing a civil fine for operating a child care facility without a license.
Title
Imposing a civil fine for operating a child care facility without a license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb312/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb312_00_0000.pdf |