KS SB309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Placing the burden of proof on the county appraiser in certain valuation and classification appeal hearings before the district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Placing the burden of proof on the county appraiser in certain valuation and classification appeal hearings before the district court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-01-24SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2020-01-23SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback