KS SB308 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the on-farm retail sale of raw, unpasteurized milk so long as certain labeling and advertising requirements are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the on-farm retail sale of raw, unpasteurized milk so long as certain labeling and advertising requirements are met.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bollier was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 23 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 3 (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Died in House Committee
2020-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 3
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Bollier was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 23
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Bollier
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-21SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-02-13SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S
2020-01-24SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-01-23SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback