KS SB305 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the bond amount required for a vehicle dealer license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the bond amount required for a vehicle dealer license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-13HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2020-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2020-02-24HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2020-02-24HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-20SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 37 Nay: 0
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-20SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-13SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2020-02-10SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, February 10, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-01-24SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-23SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback