KS SB300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 300 by Committee on Judiciary - Amending the Kansas racketeer influenced and corrupt organization act to add a person who has engaged in identity theft or identity fraud to the definition of "covered person" and add identity theft and identity fraud to the definition of "racketeering activity."
Title
Substitute for SB 300 by Committee on Judiciary - Amending the Kansas racketeer influenced and corrupt organization act to add a person who has engaged in identity theft or identity fraud to the definition of "covered person" and add identity theft and identity fraud to the definition of "racketeering activity."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 1 (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, March 28, 2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 1 |
2022-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2022-03-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 1, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2022-02-14 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 26, 2022, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |