KS SB30 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - House Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 88 Nay: 31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning taxation; income tax, determination of Kansas adjusted gross income, modifications, rates, itemized deductions and credits; sales and compensating use tax, collection and distribution thereof, STAR bonds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning taxation; income tax, determination of Kansas adjusted gross income, modifications, rates, itemized deductions and credits; sales and compensating use tax, collection and distribution thereof, STAR bonds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 88 Nay: 31 (Y: 88 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 27 Nay: 13 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 69 Nay: 52 (Y: 69 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 53 Nay: 68 (Y: 53 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-02-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 2 (Y: 123 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06HouseHouse Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 88 Nay: 31
2017-06-06SenateSenate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 27 Nay: 13
2017-06-06SenateSenate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Tuesday, June 06, 2017
2017-06-06SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, June 06, 2017
2017-06-05SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 26 Nay: 14
2017-06-05SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-06-05HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 69 Nay: 52
2017-06-05HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2017-06-05HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2017-05-30HouseHouse Representative Sawyer is appointed to replace Representative Ward on the Conference Committee
2017-05-24HouseHouse Representative Ward is appointed to replace Representative Sawyer on the Conference Committee
2017-05-23SenateSenate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Tyson, Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees
2017-05-22HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees
2017-05-22HouseHouse Motion to Reconsider Adopted
2017-05-22HouseHouse Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 53 Nay: 68
2017-05-22HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2017-05-22HouseHouse Representative Ward is appointed to replace Representative Sawyer on the Conference Committee
2017-05-03HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2017-05-03HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2017-02-23HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Johnson, Representative Phillips and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees
2017-02-23SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Tyson , Senator Kerschen and Senator Holland as conferees
2017-02-22HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 2
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Taxation
2017-02-13HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S
2017-02-03HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2017-02-03HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2017-02-02SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0
2017-02-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2017-01-31SenateSenate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders
2017-01-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2017-01-18SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 548-S
2017-01-17SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2017-01-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb30/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb30_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb30_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb30_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170202151108_929405/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170222103940_182851/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170522203139_682357/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170605213206_457711/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170606002408_029721/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170606201241_068283/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/vote_view/je_20170606215620_545088/

Bill Comments

feedback