KS SB299 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the campaign finance act to cover unified school districts having 5,000 or more students and community colleges.
Title
Expand the campaign finance act to cover unified school districts having 5,000 or more students and community colleges.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb299/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb299_00_0000.pdf |