KS SB299 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Election commissioners; role of secretary of state and boards of county commissioners.
Title
Election commissioners; role of secretary of state and boards of county commissioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 06, 2018, 09:30 AM Room 142-S |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb299/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb299_00_0000.pdf |