KS SB297 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-03 - House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the definition of "abortion" to clarify procedures that are excluded from such definition.
Title
Revising the definition of "abortion" to clarify procedures that are excluded from such definition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2023-04-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 11 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 20, 2023, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |