KS SB295 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Giving counties the authority to adopt prioritized COVID-19 vaccination plans separate from state guidelines.
Title
Giving counties the authority to adopt prioritized COVID-19 vaccination plans separate from state guidelines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 142-S |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |