KS SB292 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Updating statutes related to the Kansas army and air national guard, providing for the appointment of a state judge advocate and providing for the adjustment of death and disability benefits.
Title
Updating statutes related to the Kansas army and air national guard, providing for the appointment of a state judge advocate and providing for the adjustment of death and disability benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 37 Nay: 0 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 37 Nay: 0 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 121 Nay: 0 |
2024-04-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2024-04-01 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Ellis, Representative Carpenter, B. and Representative Weigel appointed as conferees |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Corson as conferees |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Veterans and Military |
2024-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 5, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 281-N |
2024-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans and Military |
2024-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 8, 2024, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |