KS SB292 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting who may return an advance voting ballot and the number of such ballots a person may return.
Title
Limiting who may return an advance voting ballot and the number of such ballots a person may return.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 16, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |