KS SB292 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Granting the commissioner of insurance flexibility in assessing certain excess lines coverage penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Granting the commissioner of insurance flexibility in assessing certain excess lines coverage penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2020-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-27SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-02-12SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback