KS SB290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Updating how the securities commissioner may be appointed and removed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating how the securities commissioner may be appointed and removed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2020-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-25SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-18SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2020-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-02-05SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S - CANCELED
2020-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback