KS SB290 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas code of military justice, Article 15; commanding officer's nonjudicial punishment.
Title
Kansas code of military justice, Article 15; commanding officer's nonjudicial punishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-05-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-04-29 | House | House Hearing: Monday, May 04, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 152-S |
2015-03-30 | House | House Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-25 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |