KS SB290 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use of video conferencing for arraignment hearings in criminal cases.
Title
Use of video conferencing for arraignment hearings in criminal cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2014, 10:30 a.m. Room 346-S CANCELED |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 04, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/sb290/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2013_14/measures/documents/sb290_00_0000.pdf |