KS SB289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating the version of risk-based capital instructions in effect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2020-03-16HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2020-03-09HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions; Referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Pensions
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2020-02-11SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-02-11SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 11, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2020-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback