KS SB289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing 90 days to execute electronic device search warrants and interstate transport of siezed electronic devices to perform searches.
Title
Allowing 90 days to execute electronic device search warrants and interstate transport of siezed electronic devices to perform searches.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 31, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 346-S - CANCELLED |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb289/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb289_00_0000.pdf |