KS SB284 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing motor vehicle disability placards for school districts, interlocal cooperatives, postsecondary educational institutions and department for aging and disability services institutions.
Title
Providing motor vehicle disability placards for school districts, interlocal cooperatives, postsecondary educational institutions and department for aging and disability services institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 218-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 3, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |