KS SB282 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 282 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the peer-to-peer vehicle sharing program act.
Title
Substitute for SB 282 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Enacting the peer-to-peer vehicle sharing program act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Introduced |