KS SB28 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending dates when certain reports due to department of revenue.
Title
Amending dates when certain reports due to department of revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Monday, February 13, 2017, 03:30 PM Room 346-S |
2017-02-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2017-02-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 09:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |