KS SB276 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusting the biannual transfer of certain balances in the motor carrier license fees fund to the state highway fund.
Title
Adjusting the biannual transfer of certain balances in the motor carrier license fees fund to the state highway fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 120 Nay: 1 (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, April 2, 2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2018 |
2018-03-23 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 120 Nay: 1 |
2018-03-20 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2018-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 06, 2018, 09:00 AM Room 112-N |
2018-02-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2018, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |