KS SB276 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Integrating certain statutes pertaining to business filings and limited liability companies.
Title
Integrating certain statutes pertaining to business filings and limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 118 Nay: 0 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, May 19 , 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 15, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 118 Nay: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-05-07 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Consent Calendar and placed on General Orders |
2015-05-04 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2015-04-01 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, April 30, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2015-03-23 | House | House Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2015-03-23 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |