KS SB276 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the state sovereignty over non-migratory wildlife act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the state sovereignty over non-migratory wildlife act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-12 - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 10 (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30HouseHouse Died on House Calendar
2014-04-02HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by
2014-03-05HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 12, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 346-S
2014-02-13HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources
2014-02-13HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2014-02-12SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 10
2014-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2014-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
2014-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2014-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Powell was adopted
2014-02-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Powell
2014-02-03SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
2014-01-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 23, 2014, 8:00 AM Room 159-S
2014-01-17SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
2014-01-16SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback