KS SB275 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility requirements for restricted driving privileges and exclusion from the additional 90-day wait period.
Title
Eligibility requirements for restricted driving privileges and exclusion from the additional 90-day wait period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2020-03-13 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2020-03-11 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 11, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |