KS SB273 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Senate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for Substitute for SB 273 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 small business relief act to provide funds for impacted small businesses, create the COVID-19 small business relief fund of the legislative coordinating council and the COVID-19 small business relief claims board, require certain counties to establish and administer a county COVID-19 small business relief fund and certain cities to establish and administer a city COVID-19 small business relief fund, require a study by the legislative division of post audit and prohibit compensation for intangible losses related to the COVID-19 public health emergency under the Kansas emergency management act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for Substitute for SB 273 by Committee on Judiciary - Enacting the COVID-19 small business relief act to provide funds for impacted small businesses, create the COVID-19 small business relief fund of the legislative coordinating council and the COVID-19 small business relief claims board, require certain counties to establish and administer a county COVID-19 small business relief fund and certain cities to establish and administer a city COVID-19 small business relief fund, require a study by the legislative division of post audit and prohibit compensation for intangible losses related to the COVID-19 public health emergency under the Kansas emergency management act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 24 Nay: 14 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 68 Nay: 42 (Y: 68 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed - Yea: 42 Nay: 65 (Y: 42 N: 65 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 27 Nay: 12 (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-26SenateSenate No motion to reconsider vetoed bill; Veto sustained
2021-05-26SenateSenate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, May 21, 2021
2021-05-26SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 14, 2021
2021-05-07SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 24 Nay: 14
2021-05-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) - 30 Minute Rule adopted
2021-05-07SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-05-07HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 68 Nay: 42
2021-05-07HouseHouse Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a conference committee failed Yea: 42 Nay: 65
2021-05-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 3(f) adopted.
2021-05-07HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-05-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2021-04-06HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as conferees
2021-03-30SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Warren , Senator Wilborn and Senator Haley as conferees
2021-03-30HouseHouse Final Action - Substitute passed; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2021-03-26HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-02HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-03-02HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-03-01SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 27 Nay: 12
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was withdrawn
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Pyle was adopted
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Pyle
2021-03-01SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-25SenateSenate Hearing continuation: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-24SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2021-02-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2021-02-23SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb273/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb273_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb273_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb273_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb273_04_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb273_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb273_s_1478.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb273_s_1517.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb273_s_1534.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb273_h_1961.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb273_h_2289.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb273_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb273_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb273_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb273_04_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_sb273_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_sb_273_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210301170526_808210/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210330105802_197174/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210508011010_421613/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210508011541_382342/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210508021027_936399/

Bill Comments

feedback