KS SB271 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

House Substitute for SB 271 by Committee on Education - Creating the students' right to know act to disseminate information on postsecondary education; providing specific curriculum guidance for civics instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Substitute for SB 271 by Committee on Education - Creating the students' right to know act to disseminate information on postsecondary education; providing specific curriculum guidance for civics instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21HouseHouse Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
2020-03-17HouseHouse Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Education
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-26SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2020-02-04SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 4, 2020, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2020-01-16SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2020-01-15SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback