KS SB270 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-26 - Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a sales and compensating use tax rate of 6.85% and a rate of 5.9% on food; eliminating certain itemized deductions; decreasing the rate of tax on resident individuals; tax amnesty.
Title
Providing for a sales and compensating use tax rate of 6.85% and a rate of 5.9% on food; eliminating certain itemized deductions; decreasing the rate of tax on resident individuals; tax amnesty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-12 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 21 Nay: 19 (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 44 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 66 Nay: 49 (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 82 (Y: 27 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-06-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 3 Nay: 108 (Y: 3 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Motion to Concur-Failed - Yea: 11 Nay: 28 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-05-29 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 64 Nay: 54 (Y: 64 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 44 (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 66 Nay: 49 (Y: 66 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 82 (Y: 27 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2015-06-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report not adopted - Yea: 3 Nay: 108 (Y: 3 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2015-05-29 - Senate - Senate Motion to Concur-Failed - Yea: 11 Nay: 28 (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-05-29 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 64 Nay: 54 (Y: 64 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 29 Nay: 11 (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-26 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Tuesday, June 16 , 2015 |
2015-06-26 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, June 16, 2015 |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 21 Nay: 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 44 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-11 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as fifth conferees |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report not adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as fifth conferees |
2015-06-10 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 66 Nay: 49 |
2015-06-10 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as fourth conferees |
2015-06-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as fourth conferees |
2015-06-05 | House | House Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2015-06-05 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 82 |
2015-06-05 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to accede adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as third conferees |
2015-06-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as third conferees |
2015-06-04 | House | House Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2015-06-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report not adopted; Yea: 3 Nay: 108 |
2015-06-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Donovan, Senator Tyson and Senator Holland appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-04 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as second conferees |
2015-06-04 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2015-05-29 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kleeb, Representative Suellentrop and Representative Sawyer appointed as conferees |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Donovan , Senator Tyson and Senator Holland as conferees |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to Reconsider-Adopted |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to Concur-Failed Yea: 11 Nay: 28 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-29 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 64 Nay: 54 |
2015-05-29 | House | House Emergency final action subject to amendment and debate - Amendment by Representative Kleeb was adopted. |
2015-05-29 | House | House Emergency final action subject to amendment and debate - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kleeb. |
2015-05-29 | House | House Motion pursuant to House Rule 2311 to advance bill to Final Action subject to amendment, debate and roll call adopted. |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to recommend favorably for passage failed |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to rerefer to committee failed |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Rubin was rejected |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Rubin |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Sutton was rejected |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Sutton |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Kleeb was adopted |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Kleeb |
2015-05-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be reported without recommendation. |
2015-05-15 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-05-13 | House | House Committee report recommending a substitute bill be reported without recommendation by Committee on Taxation. |
2015-05-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, May 06, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 346-S |
2015-03-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-03-24 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 29 Nay: 11 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |