KS SB27 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-23 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Substitute for SB 27 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriation revisions for FY 2017, 2018 and FY 2019 for various state agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substitute for SB 27 by Committee on Ways and Means - Appropriation revisions for FY 2017, 2018 and FY 2019 for various state agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-23SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-07SenateSenate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hearing and possible action: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2017-02-01SenateSenate Hearing and possible action: Wednesday, February 01, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2017-01-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2017-01-12SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback