KS SB269 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 10:30 am in Room 346-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing the mandatory retirement age for judges to 80 years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the mandatory retirement age for judges to 80 years of age.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-01-16SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-15SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback