KS SB266 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 9:30 am in Room 548-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring appraisal courses for county appraisers and BOTA members to be courses approved by the Kansas real estate appraisal board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring appraisal courses for county appraisers and BOTA members to be courses approved by the Kansas real estate appraisal board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-22SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2020-01-14SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback