KS SB263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a current year property tax estimate on the annual notice of valuation.
Title
Requiring a current year property tax estimate on the annual notice of valuation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 22, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb263/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb263_00_0000.pdf |