KS SB262 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a vote in Sedgwick county to allow the operation of electronic gaming machines at a racetrack gaming facility and prohibiting betting on greyhound races.
Title
Authorizing a vote in Sedgwick county to allow the operation of electronic gaming machines at a racetrack gaming facility and prohibiting betting on greyhound races.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 29, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Introduced |