KS SB26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax credit for certain purchases of goods and services by a taxpayer from qualified vendors that provide employment to individuals who are blind or disabled.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax credit for certain purchases of goods and services by a taxpayer from qualified vendors that provide employment to individuals who are blind or disabled.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 8:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2019-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback