KS SB258 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Senate Hearing: Monday, March 6, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-06 - Senate Hearing: Monday, March 6, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the act against abusive access litigation to create a civil action for determining whether litigation that alleges any access violation under the Americans with disabilities act or similar law constitutes abusive litigation and authorize penalties for such abusive litigation.
Title
Enacting the act against abusive access litigation to create a civil action for determining whether litigation that alleges any access violation under the Americans with disabilities act or similar law constitutes abusive litigation and authorize penalties for such abusive litigation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 6, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |