KS SB258 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Removing the requirement that certain entities submit certain reports to the division of post audit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removing the requirement that certain entities submit certain reports to the division of post audit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
2020-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 112-N - CANCELED
2020-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-06HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-04SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 1
2020-01-28SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2020-01-27SenateSenate Hearing: Monday, January 27, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback