KS SB256 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the start time for Sunday sales of alcoholic liquor from 12 noon to 10 a.m. and removing restrictions on sales on certain holidays.
Title
Changing the start time for Sunday sales of alcoholic liquor from 12 noon to 10 a.m. and removing restrictions on sales on certain holidays.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 15, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |