KS SB256 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 5, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Designating a portion of United States highway 50 as the SGT Gregg Steimel and PFC Richard Conrardy memorial highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of United States highway 50 as the SGT Gregg Steimel and PFC Richard Conrardy memorial highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 121 Nay: 0 (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, March 5, 2018
2018-03-02SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 02, 2018
2018-02-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 121 Nay: 0
2018-02-16HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-02-15HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, February 15, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 582-N
2018-02-07HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-02-07HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-02-06SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Doll was adopted
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Doll
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 30, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 546-S
2018-01-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2018-01-08SenateSenate Introduced
2018-01-08SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, November 16, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback