KS SB255 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-31 - House Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
Pending: House Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Kansas 911 act; audits by legislative post audit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kansas 911 act; audits by legislative post audit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-31HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Energy, Utilities and Telecommunications
2018-01-31HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2018-01-30SenateSenate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2018-01-17SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by
2018-01-16SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 16, 2018, 01:30 PM Room 548-S
2018-01-08SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2018-01-08SenateSenate Introduced
2018-01-08SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, November 16, 2017

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback