KS SB254 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - House Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
Pending: House Federal and State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning requirements of publication of certain documents by the secretary of state; relating to session laws, the Kansas register, proposed amendments to the constitution of the state of Kansas, and Kansas administrative rules and regulations and guidance documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning requirements of publication of certain documents by the secretary of state; relating to session laws, the Kansas register, proposed amendments to the constitution of the state of Kansas, and Kansas administrative rules and regulations and guidance documents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 2 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 19, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-03-18HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S - CANCELED
2020-03-04HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-03-04HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2020-02-25SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 2
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2020-02-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2020-02-24SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-02-06SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 6, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2020-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 10, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback