KS SB253 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 30 @ 10:30 am in Room 346-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending requirements for service of process on nonresident drivers and clarifying service of process on certain business entities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending requirements for service of process on nonresident drivers and clarifying service of process on certain business entities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 10, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback