KS SB252 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding medical assistance eligibility and implementing a health insurance plan reinsurance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding medical assistance eligibility and implementing a health insurance plan reinsurance program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate Died in Committee
2020-01-23SenateSenate Hearing: (proponents) Thursday, January 23, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, January 9, 2020

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback