KS SB250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-28 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
Pending: Senate Federal and State Affairs Committee
Hearing: Jan 28 @ 10:30 am in Room 144-S
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amending the definition of "race" in the Kansas act against discrimination to include traits historically associated with race, including hair texture and protective hairstyles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending the definition of "race" in the Kansas act against discrimination to include traits historically associated with race, including hair texture and protective hairstyles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-28SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 31, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback