KS SB250 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the definition of "race" in the Kansas act against discrimination to include traits historically associated with race, including hair texture and protective hairstyles.
Title
Amending the definition of "race" in the Kansas act against discrimination to include traits historically associated with race, including hair texture and protective hairstyles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 28, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Judiciary; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 31, 2019 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb250/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb250_00_0000.pdf |