KS SB247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibition by cities and counties on the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibition by cities and counties on the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 20, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Thursday, December 12, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback