KS SB245 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enact the Kansas anti-red flag act which prohibits the enforcement of extreme risk protection orders that prevent certain individuals from buying or possessing a firearm and establishes a criminal penalty for violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact the Kansas anti-red flag act which prohibits the enforcement of extreme risk protection orders that prevent certain individuals from buying or possessing a firearm and establishes a criminal penalty for violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateSenate Died in Committee
2020-01-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2020-01-13SenateSenate Introduced
2020-01-13SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 3, 2019

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback