KS SB240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-11 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a land purchase in Sherman county by the Department of Wildlife, Parks and Tourism.
Title
Authorizing a land purchase in Sherman county by the Department of Wildlife, Parks and Tourism.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, April 04, 2017, 09:00 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Introduced |