KS SB24 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Utilities
Pending: Senate Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Electric utilities and recovery of transmission costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities and recovery of transmission costs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Utilities
2019-02-27SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Utilities; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-30SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 31, 2019, 1:30 AM Room 548-S
2019-01-18SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Utilities
2019-01-17SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback