KS SB235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - House Referred to Committee on Taxation
Pending: House Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing 20 mill statewide levy for schools and exempting certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing 20 mill statewide levy for schools and exempting certain portion of property used for residential purposes from such levy.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Taxation
2019-04-01HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-03-27SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-03-25SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation and referred to Committee of the Whole
2019-03-22SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
2019-03-21SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback