KS SB235 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the carrying of concealed weapons in certain buildings.
Title
Prohibiting the carrying of concealed weapons in certain buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 23, 2017, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/sb235/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2017_18/measures/documents/sb235_00_0000.pdf |